Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Estate of Anna C. Fods
A Probate Of Will (Informal) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND. Judge Cresap, Todd L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 11, 2013
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2022
Filing Location
Burke County, ND
Judge
Category
Probate of Will (Informal)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Case Outcome Type
Judgment / Order Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Proof of Service by Mail Proof of Service by Mail |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 16 The Personal Representative's Verified Statement to Close the Estate The Personal Representative's Verified Statement to Close the Estate |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice of Proposed Distribution Notice of Proposed Distribution |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Waiver Index # 13 Waiver Waiver |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Proof of Service by Mail 01 08 2014 Proof of Service by Mail 01 08 2014 |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Proof of Service by Mail 10 18 2013 Proof of Service by Mail 10 18 2013 |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 9 Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition Commencing Probate Proceedings to Supervising Departments Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition Commencing Probate Proceedings to Supervising Departments |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 10 Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement Index # 14 Amended Inventory and Appraisement Amended Inventory and Appraisement |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 7 | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 8 | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 4 Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement Index # 3 Exemplified copy of Order Admitting Will to Probate Exemplified copy of Order Admitting Will to Probate |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 5 Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Waiver Index # 1 Renunciation and Nomination - Denice M. Kravi-Dunne Renunciation and Nomination - Denice M. Kravi-Dunne |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 2 Exemplified Copy of Last Will & Testament of Anna C. Fods (Original rec'd via mail 6/13/13) Exemplified Copy of Last Will & Testament of Anna C. Fods (Original rec'd via mail 6/13/13) |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 6 Letters Testamentary Letters Testamentary |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |