Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank vs. Lyle Lang
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND. Judge Clark, Cherie L Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $7,601.37Creditor: Discover BankDebtor: Lyle Lang (ActiveEntered: 08/24/2023Docketed: 08/24/2023, 4:10 PMDamages: $7,601.37Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 23, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 14
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 14 Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Lyle Lang Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Lyle Lang |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 13 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 12 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 10 for entry of judgment for entry of judgment |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 9 on consent on consent |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Sheriff's Return (Lyle Lang) Sheriff's Return (Lyle Lang) |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 8 Judgment On Consent - filed by attorney for plaintiff Judgment On Consent - filed by attorney for plaintiff |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 7 Proposed Order For Entry Of Judgment By Consent - filed by attorney for plaintiff Proposed Order For Entry Of Judgment By Consent - filed by attorney for plaintiff |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit Of Proof Pursuant To Stipulation And Consent, Identification And Non-Military Status Affidavit Of Proof Pursuant To Stipulation And Consent, Identification And Non-Military Status |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 4 Stipulation and Consent Stipulation and Consent |