Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GOSSI, INC. vs. UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP
On February 09, 2024 a sf case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH. Judge PETER J CORRIGAN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 09, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2024
Filing Location
Cuyahoga County, OH
Category
CONTRACT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
NEWLY FILED
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CMC BY PHONE HELD. FACT DISCOVERY CUT OFF IS AUGUST 16, 2024; DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE REGARDNG THE COVERAGE ISSUE IS OCTOBER 1, 2024. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/09/2025 AT 02:00 PM. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO INITIATE AND CONTACT THE COURT AT 216-443-8589. NOTICE ISSUED | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY D1 UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP ATTORNEY DAVID J FAGNILLI 0032930 ANSWER | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | CMC BY PHONE SET FOR 05/01/2024 AT 01:45 PM. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO INITIATE CONFERENCE CALL AND CONTACT THE COURT'S STAFF ATTORNEY AT 216-443-8589 ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES ARE REQUIRED TO PARTICIPATE AND BE FAMILIAR WITH THE UNDERLYING FACTS OF THE CASE. PARTIES NOT REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL SHALL LIKEWISE PARTICIPATE VIA PHONE. FAILURE OF ANY KIND OF THE AFOREMENTIONED PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN THE PROPERLY SCHEDULED PHONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS INCLUDING DISMISSAL OF THE CASE AND/OR JUDGMENT BEING RENDERED. | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR RUTTER/ROBERT/A. 04/09/2024 17:00:58 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR FAGNILLI/DAVID/J 04/09/2024 17:00:58 | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | USPS RECEIPT NO. 53056529 DELIVERED BY USPS 02/20/2024 UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP PROCESSED BY COC 03/13/2024. | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD FILED STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMS COMPLAINT(53056529) SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL. TO: UTICA NATIONAL INSURANCE GROUP 180 GENESEE STREET NEW HARTFORD, NY 13413 | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | WRIT FEE | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS E-FILE COPY COST | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED: COMPLAINT, SERVICE REQUEST | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPUTER FEE | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | LEGAL NEWS | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT AMOUNT PAID RUTTER & RUSSIN, L.L.C. | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | LEGAL RESEARCH | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | LEGAL AID | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | CLERK'S FEE | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGE PETER J CORRIGAN ASSIGNED (RANDOM) | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED: COMPLAINT, SERVICE REQUEST SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT AMOUNT PAID RUTTER & RUSSIN, L.L.C. SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
JUDGE PETER J CORRIGAN ASSIGNED (RANDOM) SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
COURT SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
LEGAL NEWS SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
LEGAL AID SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
LEGAL RESEARCH SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
COMPUTER FEE SF |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S FEE SF |