Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CV-2021-08-2579
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH. Judge Amy Corrigall Jones presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Summit County, OH
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 -------
Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE ISSUED BABCOCK, CLIFF
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED DERR, KALANDRA
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED NIEMI, DAREN
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED DELON, EVANA CAROLYN
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED DERR, MICHAEL
Date: Jan 06, 2022NOTICE ISSUED PODOR, KENNETH CHARLES
Date: Jan 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED BY FEDEX DERR, MICHAEL
Date: Aug 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED BY FEDEX DERR, KALANDRA
Date: Aug 18, 2021CIVIL COMPLAINT FILED
Date: Aug 17, 2021INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK FOR SERVICE
Date: Aug 17, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | This Case was transferred from Judge: CORRIGALL JONES, AMY to Judge: TOWELL, JENNIFER D. | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 7/19/22 FOR ORIGINAL COST. APPLY DEPOSIT, REFUND BALANCE. SD | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED BABCOCK, CLIFF | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO CIVIL RULE 41(A)(1) AT PLAINTIFFS COSTS | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED DERR, KALANDRA | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED NIEMI, DAREN | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED DELON, EVANA CAROLYN | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED DERR, MICHAEL | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED PODOR, KENNETH CHARLES | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed DAREN NIEMI | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed KALANDRA DERR | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed KENNETH CHARLES PODOR | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed MICHAEL DERR | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed CLIFF BABCOCK | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed EVANA CAROLYN DELON | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | FedEx Service - Served MICHAEL DERR | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | FedEx Service - Served KALANDRA DERR | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | IF A MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS NOT FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT WILL BE DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. ACJ | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY DAREN NIEMI AS COUNSEL FOR THE DEFEENDANTS KALANDRA DERR AND MICHAEL DERR. STIPULATED LEAVE TO PLEAD | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY FEDEX DERR, MICHAEL | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY FEDEX DERR, KALANDRA | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COMPLAINT FILED | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK FOR SERVICE |