Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PO-2024-26
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Oklahoma County, OK. Judge Sara Murphy Bondurant presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 03, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 23, 2024
Filing Location
Oklahoma County, OK
Status
Other
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | FPO ORDER CHARLES ERVIN REED WAS NOT SERVED FPO | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER VALID FROM 01/17/2024 THRU 01/17/2029 JUDGE BONDURANT COPIES TO PLFT / DEFT SHERIFF / OCPD | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGE BONDURANT - VPO - PETITIONER APPEARS PRO SE. RESPONDENT FAILS TO APPEAR PETITIONER SWORN IN, TESTIMONY TAKEN FINAL ORDER GRANTED THRU 1-17-2029 (5 YR) BASED ON DOMESTIC ABUSE RESPONDENT ORDERED TO ENROLL IN 52 WEEK BIP WITHIN 2 WEEKS RESPONDENT MUST REMAIN AT LEAST 100 YARDS FROM PETITIONER AT ALL TIMES RESPONDENT ORDERED TO SURRENDER ALL FIREARMS TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT RESPONDENT ORDERED TO PAY COURT COSTS | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ATTEND CBI / DOMESTIC VIOLANCE PROGRAM JUDGE BONDURANT | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER SERVED. CHARLES ERVIN REED JR WAS SERVED ON 1/3/2024 AT 2240 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUED | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONDURANT, SARA MURPHY TO THIS CASE. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER INITIAL FILING. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | LAW LIBRARY FEE | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTED. COURT DATE 1/17/2024 AT 1:30 PM WITH JUDGE BONDURANT. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER |