Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PO-2024-9
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Oklahoma County, OK. Judge Sara Murphy Bondurant presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Oklahoma County, OK
Status
Other
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | FPO ORDER KAEDYN DALTON WAS NOT SERVED FPO | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER VALID FROM 01/17/2024 THRU 01/17/2029 JUDGE BONDURANT COPIES TO PLFT / DEFT SHERIFF / OCPD | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGE BONDURANT - VPO - PETITIONER APPEARS PRO SE. RESPONDENT FAILS TO APPEAR PETITIONER SWORN IN, TESTIMONY TAKEN FINAL ORDER GRANTED THRU 1-17-2029 (5 YR) BASED ON DOMESTIC ABUSE RESPONDENT MUST REMAIN AT LEAST 100 YARDS FROM PETITIONER AT ALL TIMES RESPONDENT ORDERED TO SURRENDER ALL FIREARMS TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT RESPONDENT ORDERED TO PAY COURT COSTS | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER SERVED KAEDYN DALTON WAS SERVED ON 01/02/2024 @ 2103 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTED (SHERIFF) // COURT DATE 01/17/2024 @1:30PM WITH JUDGE BONDURANT | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONDURANT, SARA MURPHY TO THIS CASE. | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER INITIAL FILING. | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | LAW LIBRARY FEE |