Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FD-2024-00008
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Tillman County, OK. Judge Brad L. Benson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 15, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 28, 2024
Filing Location
Tillman County, OK
Judge
Status
Other
Case Documents
WAIVER OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 20, 2024PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Date: Mar 15, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OF PENDENCY OF CHILD SUPPORT ACTION | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTE-DEFECTIVE PRO SE DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |