Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The State of Texas vs. Afreonia Lazelle Spraglin, Defendant/Principal American Surety Company, Defendant/Surety
A Judgment Nisi case was filed in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX. Judge Jay A. Bender presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 05, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 09, 2024
Filing Location
Collin County, TX
Judge
Category
Judgment NISI
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NISI Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bender, Jay) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing sent to DA NISI queue sent to DA NISI queue |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Surety Surety |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Criminal Case Number 006-810442-2023 | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation NISI issued to Afreoniz Lazelle Spraglin - mailed issued to Afreoniz Lazelle Spraglin - mailed |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation By Mail Spraglin, Afreonia Lazelle Served 02/05/2024 Returned 02/05/2024 | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Criminal Bond Number 202306323 | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Bond Amount $500.00 | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition for Judgment NISI (OCA) |