Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Castro, Maya, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Piesner, Mark David, against Buckalew, Tija, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Meacham, Thomas Boyd, Iii, Spurgeon Painting, Inc., Spurgeon Painting, Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Aqui, Diane E., Aqui, Diane E, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2021 |
Category36: Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Notice of Entry of Order Castro
Date: April 30, 202497766Proof011a68
Date: May 10, 202497766Desig005cfa
Date: May 10, 2024AMENDED Motion to Disqualify Judge_Maya-combined copy
Date: April 30, 2024POS Not. Appl_042624
Date: April 30, 2024Not. Appl._04_26_24_Order
Date: April 30, 2024Motion_to_Disqualify-Maya-combined
Date: April 26, 2024Motion_to_Tax_Costs-Maya
Date: April 25, 2024Letter to Judge with our Proposed Order
Date: April 23, 2024Draft Proposed Order
Date: April 23, 2024POS_Ntc. Desig
Date: April 11, 2024Appl. Ntc. Desig. Rec._Maya
Date: April 11, 2024Motion_to_Stay_Proceedings-Maya
Date: April 15, 2024Defendant Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: April 09, 202494983Notic02a235
Date: March 29, 202494983Reply002f12
Date: March 29, 202494983Decla016832
Date: March 29, 2024Declaration of DA in support Memo of Costs Boyd
Date: March 28, 2024Declaration of DA in support Memo of Costs - Tija
Date: March 28, 2024Memo of Costs - Tija
Date: March 28, 2024Memo of Costs - Boyd
Date: March 28, 2024Defs Memorandum on Costs on Appeal
Date: March 28, 20242024-4-5 Def Motion for Bifurcation Legal and Equitable
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Propsed Jury Special Jury Instructions
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Special Verdict Forms
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Defs Est of Time for Trial
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Proposed Statement of the Case
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Dec of DA for Def MIL 1 through 4
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Propsed Long Form Jury Instructions
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Propsed Jury Questionnaire
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Propsed CACI Jury Instructions
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Signed Trial Orders
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Spurgeon MIL #4
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Spurgeon MIL #3
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Spurgeon MIL #2
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Defs Witness List
Date: March 27, 20242024-4-5 Def Spurgeon MIL #1
Date: March 27, 2024notice of entry mts defs
Date: March 25, 2024notice of entry order demurrer
Date: March 25, 2024notice of entry mts plaintiff
Date: March 25, 202494845Propo03cdb3
Date: March 28, 202494845Decla02b465
Date: March 28, 202494845Decla01cc60
Date: March 28, 202494845ExPar00a3b5
Date: March 28, 202494828Notic00b5df
Date: March 28, 202494828Proof013161
Date: March 28, 2024Objections to Maya Request for Judical Notice - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Dec of Tija Buckalew - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Objections to Mayas Declaration March 21 - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Dec of Thomas Boyd Meacham - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Dec of DA in support of Opposition to Motion - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Our Opposition to the Motion for Sanctions - Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Proposed Order for Defs Demurrer
Date: March 13, 2024Proposed Order for Plaintiffs Motion to Strike
Date: March 13, 2024Proposed Order for Defs Motion to Strike
Date: March 13, 202493209Decla00deb8
Date: March 05, 2024Dec of DJL Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4.doc 3_6_2024 Hearing
Date: March 04, 2024Def Opps to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time
Date: March 07, 2024Dec of DA iso Opposition to Ex Parte Notice
Date: March 07, 202493414ExPar008cad
Date: March 07, 2024Dec of SDA iso Opposition to Ex Parte Notice
Date: February 29, 2024Def Opps to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time
Date: February 29, 202492916ExPar005fa4
Date: February 29, 202492916Propo01bee2
Date: February 29, 2024Defs Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: February 28, 2024Defs Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
Date: February 28, 202492837Decla03f5e2
Date: February 28, 202492837Decla05f467
Date: February 28, 202492837Reque024198
Date: February 28, 202492837Objec0170a3
Date: February 28, 202492837Reply00445c
Date: February 28, 202492981Reply005e00
Date: February 29, 2024Proof of Service for Ex Parte Papers
Date: February 22, 2024Defs Objections to C Stefan Declaration
Date: February 22, 2024Declaration of DA for Opposition Motion to Strike
Date: February 22, 2024Defs Opposition to the Motion to Strike
Date: February 22, 2024Defs Objections to Maya Declaration
Date: February 22, 202492488Decla033b98
Date: February 22, 202492488Oppos02ee69
Date: February 22, 202492488Decla01bcdc
Date: February 22, 202492488Oppos004f6c
Date: February 22, 202492470Oppos00a0db
Date: February 22, 2024Proposed Order for Ex Parte
Date: February 21, 2024Defs Ex Parte Application
Date: February 21, 202491991Notic00e6bc
Date: February 14, 202491991Notic0163a6
Date: February 14, 202492004Reque00029a
Date: February 14, 202491742Motio00e8d9
Date: February 09, 202489863Proof0157a9
Date: January 11, 202489863Proof0032d5
Date: January 11, 2024Proof of Service for Ex Parte Papers
Date: January 12, 2024Ex Parte Application or Order Shortening Time
Date: January 10, 202489696Notic00850a
Date: January 09, 202489543Decla043f2a
Date: January 06, 202489543Decla025936
Date: January 06, 202489543Decla03f0d5
Date: January 06, 202489543Separ019f4e
Date: January 06, 202489543Motio0057af
Date: January 06, 202453430Proof002de1
Date: February 14, 202253621Decla00fcb2
Date: February 17, 202253656Notic00717e
Date: February 18, 2022Dec of Diane Aqui re Plaintiff's Demurrer
Date: February 18, 202253796Notic00265d
Date: February 22, 2022Defs Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 23, 2022Motion to Compel & P & A's
Date: March 07, 2022Dec of DA iso Motion to Compel
Date: March 07, 2022Separate Statement iso MTC
Date: March 07, 2022POS for Non Avail of Court Reporters
Date: March 07, 2022Updated POS for Non Avail of Court Reporter
Date: March 07, 2022POS Corrected Notice of Non Avail of Reporter
Date: March 08, 202255776Notic002bd1
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Hearing Motion to Compel & Sanctions
Date: April 05, 202255776Proof01f504
Date: April 05, 2022Defendants' Oppostion to Demurrer
Date: April 14, 202257251Subst003154
Date: May 05, 202257251Proof01383e
Date: May 05, 202257764Trial00629f
Date: May 17, 202257764Trial00629f
Date: May 19, 202258060Notic00b134
Date: May 24, 202258060Proof0176ff
Date: May 24, 2022Reply
Date: June 08, 2022Castro - Discovery report
Date: June 08, 2022Meet and Confer Dec
Date: June 10, 2022Letter to the Court re Proposed Order
Date: June 22, 2022Castro CMC Statement
Date: June 30, 2022Proposed Order for MTC and Sanctions
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: July 06, 2022Declaration of DA in support of MTS
Date: December 12, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Points and Authorities for TAC
Date: December 12, 2023Declaration of DA in support Demurrer TAC
Date: December 12, 2023Memo of Points and Authoritites for Demurrer
Date: December 12, 2023Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer
Date: December 12, 202361265Notic00db94
Date: August 02, 202263596Motio0096a2
Date: September 17, 202263596Decla012e5f
Date: September 17, 202263596Separ02a237
Date: September 17, 202263988Proof00776d
Date: September 27, 202264682Motio0087f2
Date: October 10, 202264682Decla01513e
Date: October 10, 202265221Decla012576
Date: October 20, 202265221Motio008962
Date: October 20, 202265320Motio00f603
Date: October 22, 202265320Separ028d68
Date: October 22, 202265320Decla01d0bd
Date: October 22, 2022Dec of DA iso Motion to Quash
Date: October 27, 2022Dec of TD iso Motion to Quash
Date: October 27, 2022POS for Defs Motion to Quash
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: October 27, 202266012Proof009d6c
Date: November 05, 202266118Notic008f7c
Date: November 08, 2022Defendants Notice of Hearing
Date: November 14, 202266679Decla01ee00
Date: November 19, 202266679Motio006d82
Date: November 19, 202266679Separ024ad7
Date: November 19, 202267305ExPar00b308
Date: December 05, 202267305Decla010377
Date: December 05, 202267305Propo02e5a8
Date: December 08, 202267614Stipu0054fc
Date: December 09, 20222022 12-15 Disc. Facil. Report Castro
Date: December 15, 2022Defs Opp to Sep Statement MTQ
Date: January 05, 2023Dec of Trina iso Opp to MTQ
Date: January 05, 2023Defs Opp to Motion to Quash Employment Records
Date: January 05, 2023Dec of DA iso Opp to MTQ
Date: January 05, 202369208Objec005600
Date: January 13, 202369281Respo0045ae
Date: January 14, 202369281Decla016386
Date: January 14, 202369624Decla0007a5
Date: January 21, 202369620Motio00ce5b
Date: January 21, 202371004Notic00dcf3
Date: February 16, 2023Dec of DA iso Opp to Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 15, 2023Dec of Trina iso Opp to Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 15, 2023Opposition to the Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 15, 2023Opposition to Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2023Opp to SS for the Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2023Dec of DA iso Opp to Motion to Compel
Date: February 15, 2023Dec of TND iso Opposition to MTC
Date: February 15, 2023Notice of Non Opp Motion to Quash ATT
Date: February 17, 202371186Proof02b560
Date: February 21, 202371186Oppos0095ca
Date: February 21, 202371186Subst0153c8
Date: February 21, 2023Defs Reply to Opp Motion to Quash Records ATT
Date: February 22, 202371417Reply008e84
Date: February 24, 2023Supp Dec of DA iso Reply Opp to ATT
Date: February 22, 202371416Filed009792
Date: February 24, 2023Dec of DA 5.4. ATT Motion
Date: February 27, 2023Letter to Dept 18 with our Proposed Order
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Entry of Order MTQ and Sanctions Motion
Date: April 10, 202374557Reque002f56
Date: April 22, 202374557Decla017113
Date: April 22, 202374557Motio00ee1c
Date: April 22, 202374557Separ025dbb
Date: April 22, 202374811Reque032757
Date: April 27, 202374811Decla018bef
Date: April 27, 202374811Separ02dc92
Date: April 27, 202374811Motio0062a3
Date: April 27, 202375375Decla017d69
Date: May 08, 202375375Decla02bbec
Date: May 08, 202375375ExPar0085fc
Date: May 08, 202375538Notic00a809
Date: May 10, 2023Defendants Opposition to the Ex Parte for Order Shortening Time
Date: May 10, 202375572Notic006b98
Date: May 11, 202375375Propo03b43b
Date: May 11, 202375684Decla01b64e
Date: May 12, 202375684ExPar006bb3
Date: May 12, 202375684Decla02a9fc
Date: May 12, 202375992Proof011dc9
Date: May 18, 202375992Notic00ad69
Date: May 18, 202375684Propo030d62
Date: May 18, 202376212Proof01ef5a
Date: May 23, 202376212Notic00a2dc
Date: May 23, 202376213Notic00eaea
Date: May 23, 202376636Subst00c6a2
Date: May 31, 202376731Proof01d340
Date: June 02, 202376731Desig00a2f0
Date: June 02, 202376860Subst009cb0
Date: June 05, 202376860Proof010e16
Date: June 05, 2023Respondents Notice of Designating Record on Appeal
Date: June 12, 202377310Proof01fb8e
Date: June 13, 202377310Desig0039a2
Date: June 13, 202377578Certi01ea80
Date: June 17, 202377578Proof02f293
Date: June 17, 202377578Desig005c32
Date: June 17, 202377649Certi020002
Date: June 20, 202377649Desig004a84
Date: June 20, 202377649Certi0186ad
Date: June 20, 2023Amended Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: June 22, 202377745Desig007276
Date: June 21, 202377745Proof01e38c
Date: June 21, 202378105ExPar00f5df
Date: June 28, 202378105Decla025d9b
Date: June 28, 202378105Decla01025f
Date: June 28, 202378252Desig00cc74
Date: June 30, 202378105Propo035de8
Date: June 29, 202378711Summo019507
Date: July 11, 202378705Amend0048f3
Date: July 11, 202378711Amend00660f
Date: July 11, 202378673Notic00d19a
Date: July 10, 202379175Proof015727
Date: July 19, 202379175Proof00b202
Date: July 19, 202379641Decla0110b9
Date: July 27, 202379641Decla02cd1c
Date: July 27, 202379641ExPar00793a
Date: July 27, 202379641Propo037882
Date: July 27, 2023Defs Response to Sep Statement
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration of Boyd in support of Opp MSJ
Date: August 02, 2023Defs Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 02, 2023Defs Sep Statement Castro
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration of DA in support of Opp MSJ
Date: August 02, 2023Defs AOE for Opp to MSJ
Date: August 02, 202379975ExPar002868
Date: August 02, 202379975Decla0262e0
Date: August 02, 202379975Decla015069
Date: August 02, 202379975Propo034e56
Date: August 03, 202380111Proof0124ad
Date: August 04, 202380111Subst00af2b
Date: August 04, 202380278Certi00feb4
Date: August 08, 202380441Decla010a49
Date: August 10, 202380441ExPar004839
Date: August 10, 202380441Decla02744f
Date: August 10, 2023Dec of Meacham iso Opp to File SAC
Date: August 18, 2023Declaration of DA for Opposition Motion SAC
Date: August 18, 2023Defs Opposition to the Motion for Leave to file SAC
Date: August 18, 202381308Reply00f38a
Date: August 23, 2023Proposed Order Castro MSJ
Date: August 23, 202381950Propo0076f9
Date: September 01, 202382600Summo014c31
Date: September 11, 202382600Amend003dfb
Date: September 11, 202382784Proof00d8c0
Date: September 13, 202383063Subst00d5f3
Date: September 18, 202383213Dismi0015fd
Date: September 20, 2023Motion to Bifurcate the General and Special Damages Portion of Trial
Date: October 05, 2023Joint Witness List
Date: October 05, 2023Joint Statement of the Case (Defendants Only)
Date: October 05, 2023Joint Trial Orders of the Court
Date: October 05, 2023Joint Est of Time for Trial
Date: October 05, 2023Defendants MIL #2
Date: October 05, 2023Defendants MIL #1
Date: October 05, 2023Defendants MIL #4
Date: October 05, 2023Defendants MIL #3
Date: October 05, 2023Declaration of Aqui iso Defendants MILS 1-4
Date: October 05, 2023Motion for Bifurcation Legal and Equitable
Date: October 05, 2023Propsed Jury Special Jury Instructions
Date: October 05, 2023Propsed Jury Questionnaire Pleading
Date: October 05, 2023Propsed CACI Jury Instructions
Date: October 05, 2023Propsed Jury Special Verdict Forms - Pleading Form
Date: October 05, 2023Propsed Long Form Jury Instructions
Date: October 05, 202384174Trial004277
Date: October 06, 202384174Propo011965
Date: October 06, 202384174Motio028037
Date: October 06, 202384212Decla00a047
Date: October 06, 2023Defs Reply to Demurrer to SAC
Date: October 06, 2023Declaration of DA in support of Opp to MIL 1
Date: October 10, 2023Declaration of Diane Aqui regarding; Meet and Confer before demurrer
Date: October 06, 2023Defs Opp to Plaintiffs MIL 1
Date: October 10, 2023Defs Opposition to the Motion to Strike
Date: October 06, 2023Proposed Order for Demurrer to SAC
Date: October 26, 2023Notice of Entry of Order - SAC Demurrer
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Est. 5-7 days Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
July 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Stay of Proceedings Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
July 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike_____B Strike Answer Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
July 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tax Costs
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Change of Venue Hearing
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Estimate for Respondent's Copy of Clerk's Trans | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Estimate Worksheet | |
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Ntc of Estimate for Appellant's Copy of Clerk's Transcript | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 97766Proof011a68 | |
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 97766Desig005cfa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.