Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Oklahoma County, OK, . Oklahoma County, OK Superior Courts with Anthony L. Bonner, Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOklahoma County, OK |
|
PETITION TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY
Date: February 09, 2018RETURN OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE DEFENDANT WAS UNSERVED
Date: March 06, 2018NOTIE OF PETITION TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY
Date: February 09, 2018PROOF OF PUBLICATION / JOURNAL RECORD #11497591 $156.83 PAID DIRECT
Date: February 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ORDER
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPORT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: April 26, 2018ORDER QUIETING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY
Date: April 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT HD109178 | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 80073 | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ORDER | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPORT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER QUIETING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNITED STATES FEDERATION OF AMATEUR ATHLETICS, INC ATTN: BENJAMIN FRANKLIN HART II BY CERT MAIL/ UNCLAIMED | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT SERVED LAMONAKIA HAMMONS BY LEAVING COPY WITH MELISSA ON 1/27/18 | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE DEFENDANT WAS UNSERVED | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2018-4316648 ON 03/06/2018. PAYOR: LYNN BILODEAU TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 10.00. LINE ITEMS: CV-2018-251: $10.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.